Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Rebecca Grady Jennings
Case #: 4:25-cv-00020
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause33:0901 Longshoremen Harbor Workers Compensation Act (Navigation and Navigable Waters)
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Peabody Coal Company
Defendant
Peabody Coal Company LLC
Represented By
Quiyarra McCahey
Reminger Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Peabody Energy
Defendant
Peabody Energy Corporation
Represented By
Quiyarra McCahey
Reminger Co., L.P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Barry Hunter
Represented By
David Littrell, III
Vowels Law, PLC
contact info
Austin P. Vowels
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
11 11 misc Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Mon 04/21 11:09 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)); filed by Peabody Energy Corporation. (McCahey, Quiyarra)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Mon 04/21 10:54 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)); filed by Peabody Coal Company LLC. (McCahey, Quiyarra)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate and/or Diversity Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Mon 04/21 10:53 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)); filed by Peabody Energy Corporation. (McCahey, Quiyarra)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 notice Deficiency Mon 04/14 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency re7 Answer to Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: no corporate disclosure statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/21/2025. (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/11 2:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Peabody Coal Company LLC, Peabody Energy Corporation. (McCahey, Quiyarra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/27 2:05 PM
ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/27/2025 granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Defendant's deadline for responding to Plaintiff's Complaint, (R.1 ), is extended to 4/11/2025. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/26 4:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Peabody Coal Company LLC, Peabody Energy Corporation (McCahey, Quiyarra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Vowels Emails,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/26 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Quiyarra McCahey on behalf of Peabody Coal Company LLC, Peabody Energy Corporation (McCahey, Quiyarra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/04 12:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Peabody Coal Company, Peabody Coal Company LLC, Peabody Energy, and Peabody Energy Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Tue 03/04 12:21 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (MNM)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/04 12:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Peabody Coal Company, Peabody Coal Company LLC, Peabody Energy, and Peabody Energy Corporation, filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4203082, filed by Barry Hunter. (MNM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Tendered