Weatherly v. Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C. et al
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Benjamin Beaton |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00030 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:30104 Marine Personal Injury - Jones Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
GOL, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Michelle Weatherly
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
United States Army Corps of Engineers
Terminated: 04/17/2025
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Summons Issued as to GOL, L.L.C., Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE REQUEST FOR SUMMONSES TO BE ISSUED by Teresa Michelle Weatherly re1 Complaint,5 Amended Complaint (Katz, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order - TEXT ONLY ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 04/17 1:15 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff has notified the Court that she intends to dismiss without prejudice the United States of America and the United States Army Corp s of Engineers (DN9 ). The Court therefore acknowledges the dismissal of the United States and the United States Army Corps of Engineers only from this case in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, or, in the alternative, dismisses the United States and the United States Army Corps of Engineers in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM) |
|
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal as to United States and USACE by Teresa Michelle Weatherly. (Katz, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Michelle Weatherly as to United States of America served on 3/14/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. (Katz, Brian) |
|
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Michelle Weatherly as to United States of America served on 3/20/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. (Katz, Brian) |
|
Thursday, March 13, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons Issued as to United States of America. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JM) |
|
Wednesday, March 12, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Teresa Michelle Weatherly. (Katz, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 04, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to GOL, LLC and Gulf Offshore Logistics, LLC on 3/4/2025 by Teresa Michelle Weatherly. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (MNM) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against GOL, L.L.C., Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C., United States Army Corps of Engineers, and United States of America, filed by Teresa Michelle Weatherly. (MNM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |