Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-15251

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:25-ap-01088
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Convoso, Inc.
Represented By
Convoso, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Simon E. Rodriguez, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Kevin S. Neiman
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/01 9:07 AM
Adversary Case Number 25-01088 MER Closed. (jc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 03/17 7:17 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 25-01088 MER. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. (jc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 16, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer) Sun 03/16 10:19 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez Related [+]. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 03/04 9:30 AM
Summons Service Executed On: Convoso, Inc. and Cogency Global Inc.; 3/4/25 Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 03/04 8:54 AM
Summons Issued on Convoso, Inc. Answer Due 04/3/2025. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Tue 03/04 8:53 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/04 8:53 AM
Adversary case 25-01088 Complaint by Simon E. Rodriguez against Convoso, Inc.. Fee to be Deferred. Adversary Status Deadline 06/2/2025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]