Rhode Island District Court
Judge:John J Mcconnell, Jr
Referred: Lincoln D Almond
Case #: 1:25-cv-00077
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Liam J. McCarthy
Crowley & Mccarthy, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Ferri
Represented By
Michael J. Jacobs
Laplante Sowa Goldman
contact info
Brian LaPlante
Laplante Sowa Goldman
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Mon 04/14 2:39 PM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Motion to Remand to State Court; Certified copy of order sent to the Clerk of Court for the state court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/14/2025. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Mon 04/14 2:39 PM
TEXT ORDER terminating5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/14/2025. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/25 1:14 PM
TEXT ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company; Responses due by 5/23/2025 . So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/25/2025. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 motion Remand to State Court Mon 03/24 2:52 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Anthony Ferri. Responses due by 4/7/2025.(LaPlante, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/24 2:50 PM
MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anthony Ferri. Responses due by 4/7/2025. (LaPlante, Brian)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 09, 2025
5 5 motion Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Sun 03/09 8:52 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/24/2025.(McCarthy, Liam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Award,
Att: 4 Exhibit C Appraisal Provisions,
Att: 5 Exhibit D Loss Payment Provisions
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 misc State Court Record Wed 03/05 12:39 PM
STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Wed 03/05 12:32 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/05 12:32 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/04 5:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Liam)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal - New Case Tue 03/04 5:12 PM
NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2025-00656. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ARIDC-2105657, filed by Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(McCarthy, Liam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Service Confirmation,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet CCS,
Att: 4 Appendix Notice to State Court of Filing