Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen C Dries
Case #: 2:25-cv-00321
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 respm Brief (Non-Motion) Mon 05/05 3:41 PM
BRIEF (Unsigned) filed by Jayshonn M Duffie re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus.(kah) Modified on 5/5/2025 (kah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge on Consent Fri 03/28 11:57 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/28/2025. The parties have consented to the exercise of jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that this action is reassigned to him for all further proceedings and that Judge Lynn Adelman is no longer assigned to this case. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(amh)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 03/28 10:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Status Conference held on 3/28/2025. Parties update Court on discussions regarding a possible settlement. Status Conference set for 4/16/2025 at 10:30 AM by Telephone before Judge Lynn Adelman. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 669-254-5252 and use Meeting ID 161 8470 1401 and Passcode 187773 to join the call and may be placed on hold until the Court accesses the call. Parties should call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. Docketed in error to incorrect case. (amh) Modified on 3/28/2025 and NEF regenerated. (amh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 03/27 9:06 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Christopher Stevens. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Potts, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
notice Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate Tue 03/25 8:54 AM
NOTICE from the clerk to Respondent Christopher Stevens requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available[LINK:here] . (amb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/25 10:09 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jayshonn M Duffie. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.)(amb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail CS Potts on behalf of Christopher Stevens. Attorney(s) appearing: Abigail C.S. Potts(Potts, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
5 5 service Acceptance of Service by DOJ Wed 03/19 4:50 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Christopher Stevens(Held, Eliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/19 3:58 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/19/2025. IT IS ORDERED that within 60 days of the date of this order respondent either answer the petition, complying with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing § 2254 Cases, or file a dispositive motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall abide by the following schedule regarding the filing of briefs on the merits of petitioner's claims: (1) petitioner shall have 45 days following the filing of respondent's answer within which to file his brief in support of his petition; (2) respondent shall have 45 days following the filing of petitioner's initial brief within which to file a brief in opposition; and (3) petitioner shall have 30 days following the filing of respondent's opposition brief within which to file a reply brief, if any. In the event that respondent files a dispositive motion and supporting brief in lieu of an answer, this briefing schedule will be suspended and the briefing schedule will be as follows: (1) petitioner shall have 45 days following the filing of respondent's dispositive motion and supporting initial brief within which to file a brief in opposition; and (2) respondent shall have 30 days following the filing of petitioner's opposition brief within which to file a reply brief, if any. Additional details in order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(amh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
3 3 misc Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate Tue 03/04 3:36 PM
LETTER from the clerk to Jayshonn M Duffie re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (bx)
Related: [-]
2 2 respm Brief (Non-Motion) Tue 03/04 3:28 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Jayshonn M Duffie re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (bx)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 03/04 3:27 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jayshonn M Duffie. (Filing Fee PAID $5 Receipt #:98108)(bx)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Envelope