Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:25-cv-00245
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 5:37 AM EDT
Defendant
John Bussolari
Represented By
Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Malisa Dang
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Defendant
Prisma Graphics, LLC
Represented By
Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Malisa Dang
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Defendant
Richard Chip Sheridan
Represented By
Katherine Randolph Fry
Offit Kurman, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company
Represented By
William H. Foster
contact info
Katie E. Towery
contact info
Sara Barry
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Shaun Michael Kelly
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Alan Richard Silverstein
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
James M. Witz
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
50 50 misc Letter Thu 05/15 4:11 PM
Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Lauren E.M. Russell, regarding proposed Stipulated Forensic Protocol and Inspection Order.(Russell, Lauren) Modified on 5/15/2025 (nms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
49 49 misc Letter Thu 05/15 4:03 PM
Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Shaun Michael Kelly regarding Proposed Stipulated Forensic Protocol and Inspection Order - re 47 Oral Order,.(Kelly, Shaun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-2
48 48 misc Letter Thu 05/15 3:33 PM
Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Katherine R. Fry, Esq., regarding proposed Forensic Protocol and Inspection Order.(Fry, Katherine) Modified on 5/15/2025 (nms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 09, 2025
47 47 order Oral Order Fri 05/09 4:30 PM
ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised they have reached an impasse on certain language to be used in the Proposed Forensic Protocol and Inspection Order. In light of that, simultaneous letter submissions (no more than three pages each), with the parties proposed order attached shall be due by 5/15/2025. The parties are also instructed to send a Word version of their proposed order to the Court's Case Manager. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/9/2025. (nms)
Related: [-]