Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Scott L Palk
Case #: 5:25-cv-00274
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 4:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Dr Regan H Bradford
Defendant
Dean McGee Eye Institute
Defendant
Insurance Holders
non-party
Chris M Stephens
Represented By
Chris M Stephens
Us District Courthouse-Okc
contact info
Plaintiff
Harry Burns, Jr
1622 NW 3rd St
Oklahoma City, OK 73106


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
9 9 order Judgment Wed 03/26 9:43 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL . Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 3/26/2025. (llg)
Related: [-]
8 8 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/26 9:35 AM
ORDER . This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. A separate judgment of dismissal shall be entered contemporaneously with this Order. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 3/26/2025. (llg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/24 10:31 AM
ORDER the Application and Supplemental Application, Docs. 2, 5, 6, are GRANTED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens on 3/24/2025. (ac)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
6 6 misc Supplement Fri 03/21 4:09 PM
SUPPLEMENT re5 Supplement by Harry Burns, Jr. (alw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
5 5 misc Supplement Thu 03/20 4:36 PM
SUPPLEMENT re4 Order by Harry Burns, Jr.(llr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Supporting Documents,
Att: 2 Attachment 2 - Note to Judge
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/07 11:11 AM
ORDER to CURE re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M Stephens on 3/7/2025. (ac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Referring Motion Tue 03/04 12:15 PM
ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Harry Burns, Jr. Referred to Magistrate Judge Chris M. Stephens. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 03/04/2025. (alw) Modified on 3/4/2025 to add referral information (alw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/04 12:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harry Burns, Jr. (alw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/04 12:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Regan H Bradford, Dean McGee Eye Institute, Insurance Holders filed by Harry Burns, Jr.(alw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Notes to Judge,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Abduction by Technology,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Implants and Brain Wiring,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Oklahoma Health Care Authority,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Envelope,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Statements,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Oklahoma Attorney General Mr. Mike Hunter,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - 5.8.2021 Oklahoma Attorney General,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - You Know What This Is,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Medicare-Medicaid,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - The Biden-Harris administration,
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet