Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00316
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 12:16 AM MST
Defendant
Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia (1)
Represented By
Mark Jeffrey Andersen
Law Office Of Mark J Andersen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rachel Elizabeth Nava
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/05/2025 1:08 AM MST
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
Arrest of Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia on 2/12/2025. (AO) [2:25-mj-06038-ASB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia. (AO) [2:25-mj-06038-ASB]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus: Initial Appearance as to Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia held on 2/14/2025. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. The Court finds the defendant indigent and appoints CJA Attorney Mark Andersen as counsel of record. The Government is seeking detention. Defendant waives a formal reading, waives the Preliminary Hearing, and submits the issue of detention to the Court. The Court finds that probable cause has been established with regard to the Criminal Complaint and further finds by a preponderance of the evidence the defendant is a flight risk. IT IS ORDERED detaining the defendant pending further proceedings. SPANISH INTERPRETER REQUIRED FOR DEFENDANT . As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Margaret Perlmeter for the Government, CJA Attorney Mark Andersen for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Matt Ren assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 2:45 PM to 2:55 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WMT) [2:25-mj-06038-ASB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus.(WMT)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:25-mj-06038-ASB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia: The Court concludes that the following facts require the detention of the defendant pending further proceedings in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Conclusions of Law: (1) There is a serious risk that the defendant will flee. (2) No condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the defendant as required. Directions Regarding Detention: The defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his/her designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus on 2/14/25. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WMT) [2:25-mj-06038-ASB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
6 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia.(Andersen, Mark) [2:25-mj-06038-ASB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 ORDER granting6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 2/19/2025. (ah) [2:25-mj-06038-ASB]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 INFORMATION - Felony as to Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia (1) count(s) 1. (NSH)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia. (NSH)
Related: [-]
10 10 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia for Guilty Plea Hearing before a United States Magistrate Judge. (NSH)
Related: [-]
11 11 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M. Lanham. Filed by USA as to Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia. (NSH)
Related: [-]
12 12 MINUTE ORDER as to Juan Francisco Mendoza-Tapia. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Alison S. Bachus to set a Change of Plea Hearing. (NSH)
Related: [-]