Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00322
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 12:24 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Schuyler Jefferson Smith
Us Attorneys Office - Yuma, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Elsy Esmeralda Beltran-Murcia (1)
Terminated: 03/03/2025
Represented By
Travis Michael O'Neal
Federal Public Defenders Office - Yuma
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/05/2025 1:22 AM MST
Friday, February 28, 2025
Arrest of Elsy Esmeralda Beltran-Murcia on 2/28/2025. (NM) [2:25-mj-01343-JFM]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Elsy Esmeralda Beltran-Murcia. (NM) [2:25-mj-01343-JFM]
Related: [-]
2 2 INFORMATION - Felony as to Elsy Esmeralda Beltran-Murcia (1) count(s) 1, 2. (JMA)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Elsy Esmeralda Beltran-Murcia. (JMA)
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Initial Appearance as to Elsy Esmeralda Beltran-Murcia held on 3/3/2025. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. FPD, Travis Michael O'Neal is appointed for defendant. Arraignment held on 3/3/2025. Plea and Sentence Hearing held on 3/3/2025. Defendant (1) enters a plea of guilty and is sentenced as to Count 2 of the Information, Count 1 of the Information is dismissed. Special assessment is remitted. Interpreter required Spanish. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Schuyler Smith for the Government, AFPD Travis Michael O'Neal for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Miguel Aguayo assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 2:57 PM to 3:04 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JMA)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf.(JMA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
6 6 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Elsy Esmeralda Beltran-Murcia. (JMA)
Related: [-]
7 7 JUDGMENT AND COMMITMENT ISSUED as to Elsy Esmeralda Beltran-Murcia (1), Count(s) 2. BOP CUSTODY THIRTY (30) DAYS WITH CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED. SPECIAL ASSESSMENT: REMITTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 3/03/2025. (JMA)
Related: [-]