California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-00938
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 11:33 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
TCL Android Cellphone ("Target Device 2") (1)
Terminated: 03/03/2025


Docket last updated: 03/05/2025 12:39 AM PST
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to TCL Android Cellphone ("Target Device 2"). (gac)
Related: [-]