California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:25-cv-00391
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 3:07 AM PDT
Defendant
Kika Scott
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Dmitrieva
2711 E. Wilson Avenue
Orange, CA 92867


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
14 14 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Mon 05/05 3:05 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Maria Dmitrieva, upon Defendant Kika Scott on 3/17/2025. Answer due 05/16/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 04/25 3:03 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,12 . The following error(s) was/were found: case number missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Fri 04/25 3:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maria Dmitrieva, upon Defendant Kika Scott served on 3/17/2025, answer due 5/16/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to not indicated. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 03/11 12:03 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Defendant Kika Scott. (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
10 10 9 pgs order Order Fri 03/07 7:00 AM
SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (yl)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/06 11:26 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
8 8 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Wed 03/05 8:22 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER) by Judge John W. Holcomb: IT IS ORDERED that the3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) is GRANTED. (es)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/04 9:19 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/04 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
7 7 misc Exhibit (non-trial) Tue 03/04 1:21 PM
Filing of Exhibits in Support of Complaint filed by Plaintiff Maria Dmitrieva as to Complaint1 . (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 03/04 9:15 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery)1 filed by Plaintiff Maria Dmitrieva. (jtil)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Tue 03/04 9:10 AM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Maria Dmitrieva. (jtil)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/04 9:07 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maria Dmitrieva. (jtil)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 03/04 9:05 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Maria Dmitrieva against Defendant Kika Scott. Case assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV71