California Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:25-cv-02236
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:201 Petition for Enforcement of Foreign Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 1:31 AM PDT
Petitioner
Prodigy Finance CM2020-1 DAC
Represented By
Shannon Beamer
Venable LLP
contact info
Respondent
Joshua John Nduwamungu


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
14 14 motion Entry of Default Tue 05/20 2:51 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Respondent Joshua John Nduwamungu filed by Prodigy Finance CM2020-1 DAC.(Beamer, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Shannon E. Beamer in Support of Petitioners Application,
Att: 2 Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 19, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/19 1:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prodigy Finance CM2020-1 DAC. Joshua John Nduwamungu served on 4/1/2025, answer due 4/22/2025. (Beamer, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Declination of Default Thu 05/15 7:50 AM
Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to Joshua John Nduwamungu. Summons has not been returned as executed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Related [+](far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s)11
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
11 11 motion Entry of Default Wed 05/14 1:08 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Against Respondent Joshua John Nduwamungu filed by Prodigy Finance CM2020-1 DAC.(Beamer, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Declaration of Shannon E. Beamer in Support of Application for Entry of Default,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, April 04, 2025
10 10 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 04/04 12:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Prodigy Finance CM2020-1 DAC (Beamer, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
9 9 misc Refund Status Mon 03/17 5:53 PM
Refund re8 Application for Refund Status: Approved. (kep, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 misc Application for Refund Fri 03/07 9:26 PM
Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-20417952 by Prodigy Finance CM2020-1 DAC. (Beamer, Shannon)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 03/07 12:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Joshua John Nduwamungu. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 03/07 11:44 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Prodigy Finance CM2020-1 DAC.. (Beamer, Shannon)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Fri 03/07 11:42 AM
Proposed Summons. (Beamer, Shannon)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 03/07 11:40 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Prodigy Finance CM2020-1 DAC (Beamer, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 03/06 11:16 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 03/05 9:31 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/19/2025. (pjf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
1 1 7 pgs cmp Petition Tue 03/04 6:35 PM
PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD against Joshua John Nduwamungu (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20417976). Filed by Prodigy Finance CM2020-1 DAC.(Beamer, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Shannon E. Beamer,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet