Armbruster et al v. ByteDance Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Eumi K Lee |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-02239 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2025 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 1:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ByteDance Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TikTok LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TikTok Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TikTok Pte. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Armbruster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yolanda Berry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
29 | 29
![]() CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CT0-1) by the MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, MDL No. 3144. (gba, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Remark
Thu 04/17 11:02 AM
Transferring case electronically to the Central District of California. (gba, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order Lifting Stay
Mon 04/14 7:10 PM
In light of the transfer order entered in In re: TikTok, Inc., Minor Privacy Litigation , MDL No. 3144, Dkt. No. 88, the Court vacates the stay 27 issued on 4/14/2025. The Court terminates Defendants pending 25 motion to transfer the case to the Central District of California. This is done without prejudice to re-noticing the motion after the conclusion of the MDL proceedings. Entered by Judge Eumi K. Lee on April 14, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ekllc3, COURT STAFF) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order Staying Case
Mon 04/14 11:23 AM
This case is hereby STAYED pending a ruling on the motion to create Multi-District Litigation that includes this case, heard on March 27, 2025. The parties shall file an administrative motion to lift the stay within 7 days of the issuance of the order concerning the Multi-District Litigation, attaching a copy of the order. See Civ. L.R. 7-11. Entered by Judge Eumi K. Lee on April 14, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ekllc3, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byRyan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry.(Flynn, Francis) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() MOTION to Transfer Case filed by ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Eumi K Lee. Responses due by 4/9/2025. Replies due by 4/16/2025.(Petrocelli, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen D. Brody. Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee. (lrt, COURT STAFF) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TikTok Ltd. for TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd.; Corporate Parent ByteDance Ltd. for ByteDance Inc., TikTok Ltd.; Corporate Parent TikTok Inc. for TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc.; Corporate Parent TikTok LLC for TikTok Inc.. and Certificate of Interested Entities (Petrocelli, Daniel) |
|
22 | 22
![]() MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20493300.) filed by ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc.. (Brody, Stephen) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Tue 03/25 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Matthew David Powers on behalf of ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. (Powers, Matthew) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Tue 03/25 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Daniel M. Petrocelli on behalf of ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. (Petrocelli, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, March 06, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Yolanda Berry, Ryan Armbruster. Service waived by TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. waiver sent on 3/5/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
18 | 18
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Yolanda Berry, Ryan Armbruster. Service waived by TikTok LLC waiver sent on 3/5/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
17 | 17
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Yolanda Berry, Ryan Armbruster. Service waived by TikTok Inc. waiver sent on 3/5/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
16 | 16
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Yolanda Berry, Ryan Armbruster. Service waived by ByteDance Inc. waiver sent on 3/5/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
15 | 15
![]() REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TIKTOK U.S. DATA SECURITY, INC. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
14 | 14
![]() REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TIKTOK PTE. LTD. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
13 | 13
![]() REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TIKTOK LTD. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
12 | 12
![]() REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TIKTOK LLC on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
11 | 11
![]() REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TIKTOK INC. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
10 | 10
![]() REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to BYTEDANCE LTD. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
9 | 9
![]() REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bytedance Inc. on 3/5/2025 by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2025. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
Wednesday, March 05, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry of Related Actions and Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Pursuant to Local Rules 3-12 and 3-13(Flynn, Francis) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
Wed 03/05 5:25 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Eumi K. Lee. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting. Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at eklcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 6/16/2025 at 5:00PM PT. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 03/05 3:23 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sfb, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry.. (Flynn, Francis) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2025 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (gba, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 03/05 9:22 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/19/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/05 4:14 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Eumi K Lee. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case, except for discovery purposes. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
||
Tuesday, March 04, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Ryan Armbruster, Yolanda Berry (Flynn, Francis) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., TikTok Inc., TikTok LLC, TikTok Ltd., TikTok Pte. Ltd., TikTok U.S. Data Security, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20418004.). Filed by Yolanda Berry, Ryan Armbruster.(Flynn, Francis) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |