Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alfredo R Perez
Case #: 4:25-bk-90083
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million

Debtor
ENGlobal Corporation
11740 Katy Fwy Ste 350
Houston, TX 77079-1253
Represented By
Ryan Anthony O'Connor
Okin Adams LLP
contact info
John Thomas Oldham
Okin Adams LLP
contact info
Madeline Mason Schmidt
Okin Adams LLP
contact info
Christopher Adams
Okin & Adams LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 11:26 AM CDT
Creditor
Wholesale Electric Supply Company of Houston, Inc.
Represented By
Bryce Calvin Latray
Andrews Myers, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
V Energy Industrial Park I, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Kevin Powers
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Creditor
The County of Brazos, Texas
McCreary Veselka Bragg & Allen, PC Attn: Julie Anne Parsons PO Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Julie Anne Parsons
Mccreary Veselka Bragg & Allen PC
contact info
Creditor
LEAF Capital Funding, LLC
100 Throckmorton Street, Suite 700
Fort Worth, TX 76102
Represented By
Jessica Nicole Alt
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
John Easter
Padfield & Stout, LLP
contact info
Creditor
FMC Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth Mary Guffy
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Creditor
Rexel USA, Inc.
Coats Rose, P.C. c/o Richard Fulton 9 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1000
Houston, TX 77046
Represented By
Nancy H Hamren
Coats Rose, P.C.
contact info
Richard A Fulton
Coats Rose, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Carson Portwall Management, LLC
Represented By
Gus E Pappas
Dabney Pappas
contact info
Creditor
Spring Branch Independent School District and City of Houston
Represented By
Tara L Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Melissa E Valdez
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Rusk county
LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP c/o John Kendrick Turner 3500 Maple Avenue Suite 800
Dallas, TX 75219
Represented By
Tara L Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Melissa E Valdez
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
John Kendrick Turner
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County, ATTN: Property Tax Division
Harris County Attorney's Office P.O. Box 2848
Houston, TX 77252
Represented By
Tara L Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Melissa E Valdez
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Susan R. Fuertes
Harris County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP C/O Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Tara L Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Melissa E Valdez
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Gulf Island Fabrication, Inc.
Represented By
Caroline M. Lee
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Mark Mintz
Jones Walker
contact info
Interested Party
Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By
Aaron J Power
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
KROLL RESTRUCTURING ADMINISTRATION LLC
1 WORLD TRADE CTR FL 31
NEW YORK, NY 10007
Other Prof.
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
1 World Trade Center 31st Floor
New York, NY 10007
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Ha Minh Nguyen
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Alicia Lenae Barcomb
Doj-U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
127 127 misc Affidavit Wed 05/14 11:53 AM
Affidavit Re: of Nelson Crespin Regarding Order (I) Approving Asset Purchase Agreement and Authorizing the Sale of the Debtors Assets Outside the Ordinary Course of Business, (II) Authorizing the Sale of Assets Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests (III) Authorizing the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and (IV) Granting Related Relief . Related [+]. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 118 Generic Order
Monday, May 12, 2025
126 126 7 pgs misc Affidavit Mon 05/12 2:43 PM
Affidavit Re: of Nelson Crespin Regarding Notice of Selection of Stalking Horse Purchaser . Related [+]. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 89 Notice
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
125 125 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Wed 05/07 10:24 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 3/29/2025, $0 disbursed (Filed By ENGlobal Technologies, LLC ). (Oldham, John Thomas)
Related: [-]
124 124 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Wed 05/07 10:22 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 3/29/2025, $0 disbursed (Filed By ENGlobal U.S., Inc. ). (Oldham, John Thomas)
Related: [-]
123 123 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Wed 05/07 10:21 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 3/29/2025, $0 disbursed (Filed By ENGlobal Government Services, Inc. ). (Oldham, John Thomas)
Related: [-]
122 122 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Wed 05/07 10:19 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 3/29/2025, $1387116 disbursed (Filed By ENGlobal Corporation ). (Oldham, John Thomas)
Related: [-]