Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Mark E Walker
Referred: Martin A Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:25-cv-00066
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Terminated:May 16, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
SANDY'S CONSIGNMENT BOUTIQUE INC
Plaintiff
MAKEDA EVANS
Represented By
ALEKSANDRA KRAVETS
Aleksandra Kravets Esq - Hollywood Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/16 8:15 AM
ORDER CLOSING THE FILE, re 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/16/2025. The Clerk must close the file. (kdm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/15 6:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by MAKEDA EVANS. (KRAVETS, ALEKSANDRA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/29 7:03 AM
ORDER GRANTING 8 MOTION FOR EXTENSION. ( Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to on or before Wednesday, 5/21/2025) . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/28/2025. (kdm)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/28 4:07 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by SANDY'S CONSIGNMENT BOUTIQUE INC. (EDINGER, GARY)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GARY SCOTT EDINGER on behalf of SANDY'S CONSIGNMENT BOUTIQUE INC (EDINGER, GARY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/22 10:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAKEDA EVANS. SANDY'S CONSIGNMENT BOUTIQUE INC served on 4/15/2025, answer due 5/6/2025. (KRAVETS, ALEKSANDRA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 03/31 10:13 AM
Summons Issued as to SANDY'S CONSIGNMENT BOUTIQUE INC. (kdm)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 03/31 9:34 AM
NOTICE request for issuance of summons by MAKEDA EVANS re1 Complaint (KRAVETS, ALEKSANDRA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KRAVETS, ALEKSANDRA)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs COMPLAINT MAKEDA EVANS against SANDYS CONSIGNMENT BOUTIQUE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9393419.), filed by MAKEDA EVANS. (KRAVETS, ALEKSANDRA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed summons