New York Northern District Court
Judge:David N Hurd
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 9:25-cv-00282
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 order Order on Letter Request Tue 04/29 11:22 AM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Letter Request. Defendant Gregory Ceballo-Olazo's response to the complaint is due by June 27, 2025. The Rule 16 conference scheduled for June 25, 2025 is rescheduled for July 16, 2025 at 10 am. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/9/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Authorized by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on April 29, 2025. (nas )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
7 7 motion Letter Request/Motion Mon 04/28 12:27 PM
Letter Motion from AAG Olivia R. Cox for Gregory Ceballo-Olazo requesting a 60-day extension of the answer deadline submitted to Judge Stewart . (Cox, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 04/04 9:43 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Gregory Ceballo-Olazo (via Frank Usher, c/o Washington Correctional Facility) on 03/27/2025, filed by Jason Finch. (Sivin, Edward)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 04/04 11:16 AM
***Answer due date updated for Gregory Ceballo-Olazo answer due 4/17/2025. (nas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/18 5:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Glenn D. Miller on behalf of Jason Finch (Miller, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/05 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Sivin on behalf of Jason Finch (Sivin, Edward)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 03/05 9:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Gregory Ceballo-Olazo. (nas )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Wed 03/05 9:22 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/5/2025 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/29/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (nas )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/05 9:20 AM
COMPLAINT against Gregory Ceballo-Olazo (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-7047747) filed by Jason Finch.(nas )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet