Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Myron H Thompson
Referred: Kelly F Pate
Case #: 2:25-cv-00178
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 3:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Magnolia Woods
Plaintiff
LaKeisha Simmons
PO Box 210115
Montgomery, AL 36121


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
10 10 cmp Complaint, Amended Tue 05/06 4:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY demand against Magnolia Woods, filed by LaKeisha Simmons. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
9 9 5 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 12:49 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff is to file an Amended Complaint on or before May 9, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 4/25/2025. (c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/23 10:31 AM
ORDER granting 3 7 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to STAY service of process so the Court may conduct its obligatory review of Plaintiff's Complaint under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 4/23/2025. (c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/28 3:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Long Form). (LAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/17 3:38 PM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that by March 31, 2025, Plf must amend her pending motion by completing and filing the Court's long-form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide Plf with a copy of the long-form application with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 3/17/2025.(BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Blank IFP Long Form
Thursday, March 06, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 03/06 9:27 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: it is ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 USC 636, this case is referred to the US Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/6/2025. (BES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
4 4 service Proposed Summons Wed 03/05 11:22 AM
Proposed Summons as to Magnolia Woods. (LAB)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/05 11:19 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by LaKeisha Simmons. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Application
2 2 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Wed 03/05 11:17 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement re1 Complaint filed by LaKeisha Simmons. (LAB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/05 11:15 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY demand against Magnolia Woods, filed by LaKeisha Simmons. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 6/3/2025. (LAB)
Related: [-]