Hicks v. Lang et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy D Degiusti |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00281 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Stephens County District Court, CJ-24-00169 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 18, 2025 3:30 AM CDT |
Defendant
Board of Commisoners for Stephens County, Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joshua Hawkins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rick Lang
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Turn Key Health Clinics LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Hicks
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joshua Hawkins.(Garrison, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sarah Hicks. (Warren, John) |
|
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sarah Hicks (Warren, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Due 4/17/2025. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/8/2025. (jee) |
|
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION to Dismiss by Sarah Hicks. (Warren, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sarah Hicks (Warren, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Rick Lang.(Morrow, Howard) |
|
19 | 19
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Board of Commisoners for Stephens County, Oklahoma.(Wood, Randall) |
|
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen L Geries on behalf of Rick Lang (Geries, Stephen) |
|
17 | 17
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by Joshua Hawkins.(Garrison, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC. (Winter, Anthony) |
|
15 | 15
![]() DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC . (Winter, Anthony) |
|
14 | 14
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony C Winter on behalf of Turn Key Health Clinics LLC (Winter, Anthony) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Sean P Snider on behalf of Turn Key Health Clinics LLC (Snider, Sean) |
|
12 | 12
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Howard T Morrow on behalf of Rick Lang (Morrow, Howard) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Answer or response due 3/18/2025. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/11/2025. (jee) |
|
10 | 10
![]() DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sarah Hicks. (Warren, John) |
|
9 | 9
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Donald E Smolen, II on behalf of Sarah Hicks (Smolen, Donald) |
|
8 | 8
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by John William Warren on behalf of Sarah Hicks (Warren, John) |
|
7 | 7
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by William R Moon, Jr on behalf of Rick Lang (Moon, William) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew Christian Garrison on behalf of Joshua Hawkins (Garrison, Andrew) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A LeBlanc on behalf of Joshua Hawkins (LeBlanc, Thomas) |
|
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading by Board of Commisoners for Stephens County, Oklahoma. (Wood, Randall) |
|
Thursday, March 06, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Board of Commisoners for Stephens County, Oklahoma . (Wood, Randall) |
|
Wednesday, March 05, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Randall J Wood on behalf of Board of Commisoners for Stephens County, Oklahoma (Wood, Randall) |
|
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Wed 03/05 9:10 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Hicks v Lang Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4643717. (Wood, Randall) |
||
Tuesday, March 04, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Stephens County District Court, case number CJ-2024-169 filed by Rick Lang, Board of Commisoners for Stephens County, Oklahoma, Joshua Hawkins, Turn Key Health Clinics LLC.(llr) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |