Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Marilyn J Horan
Case #: 2:25-cv-00328
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1365 Environmental Matters
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
W.G. TOMKO, INC.
Represented By
Steven M. Toprani
Wg Tomko Inc.
contact info
Richard J. Cromer
Leech Tishman
contact info
Plaintiff
CENTER FOR COALFIELD JUSTICE
Represented By
Evan Dimond Johns
Appalachian Mountain Advocates
contact info


Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
16 16 respoth Response in Opposition Wed 05/14 2:41 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to13 Errata,11 Motion to Strike, filed by CENTER FOR COALFIELD JUSTICE. (Johns, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Toprani on behalf of W.G. TOMKO, INC.. (Toprani, Steven)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Wed 05/07 9:09 AM
TEXT ORDER In light of the errata13 , the Order granting the Motion to Strike12 is vacated. Plaintiff shall respond to said Motion on or before May 14, 2025. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/7/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
13 13 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Tue 05/06 2:07 PM
Errata re11 Motion to Strike by W.G. TOMKO, INC. Reason for Correction: Error in prior Motion. (Cromer, Richard) Modified text on 5/6/2025. (cel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Tue 05/06 12:17 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Strike. upon consideration of Defendant W.G.Tomko, Inc.'s Motion to Strike and representations by defense counsel that Plaintiff does not object, it is hereby ORDERED that said Motion is GRANTED and the Declaration attached to Plaintiff Center for Coalfield Justice's Response in Opposition is stricken and shall not be considered by the Court. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/6/2025. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 motion Strike Mon 05/05 2:26 PM
MOTION to Strike10 Response in Opposition by W.G. TOMKO, INC. (Cromer, Richard) Modified text on 5/5/2025. (cel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 16 pgs respoth Response in Opposition Thu 04/17 10:59 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by CENTER FOR COALFIELD JUSTICE. (Johns, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Darla Savko
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Thu 03/27 3:08 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by W.G. TOMKO, INC.. (Cromer, Richard)
Related: [-]
8 8 8 pgs respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 03/27 2:59 PM
BRIEF in Support re7 Motion to Dismiss 1 Complaint filed by W.G. TOMKO, INC. (Cromer, Richard) Modified text on 3/27/2025. (cel)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/27 2:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 COMPLAINT for Failure to State a Claim, by W.G. TOMKO, INC. (Cromer, Richard) Modified text on 3/27/2025. (cel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
misc QC - Wrong event selected Mon 03/24 12:08 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re5 Affidavit of Service. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
6 6 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Mon 03/24 12:05 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CENTER FOR COALFIELD JUSTICE. W.G. TOMKO, INC. served on 3/6/2025, answer due 3/27/2025. (cel)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Thu 03/20 5:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint by Jaison Hickey, served on Steven M. Toprani on March 6, 2025, filed by CENTER FOR COALFIELD JUSTICE. (Johns, Evan)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Thu 03/20 3:42 PM
STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE available[LINK:Here] . Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/20/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 03/05 4:14 PM
Summons Issued as to W.G. TOMKO, INC. (cel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 03/05 12:49 PM
Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR COALFIELD JUSTICE. (Johns, Evan)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Wed 03/05 12:36 PM
COMPLAINT against W.G. TOMKO, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8736074), filed by CENTER FOR COALFIELD JUSTICE. (Johns, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A. Notice Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit B. NPDES Permit No. PA0255858,
Att: 4 Exhibit C. Table of Violations,
Att: 5 Summons W.G. Tomko, Inc.
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 03/05 4:07 PM
Judge Marilyn J. Horan added. (cel)
Related: [-]