Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-61376

Virginia Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Rebecca B Connelly
Case #: 6:25-ap-06004
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Terminated:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jennifer Ellen Krom
1674 Wilson Church Rd
Bedford, VA 24523
Represented By
Malissa Lambert Giles
Giles & Lambert PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Sheehy
2121 Hitching Post Ct
Elverta, CA 95626
Represented By
Christopher Sheehy
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
6 6 court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/10 9:13 AM
Adversary Case 6:25-ap-6004 Closed (Martin, Julie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/29 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/28/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Disposition of Adversary
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
4 4 order Disposition of Adversary Wed 03/26 4:35 PM
Disposition of Adversary 6:2025-ap-6004-rbc Dismissing Adversary for failure to pay filing fee . Case to Be Closed if Applicable 04/9/2025. (Spitzer, Angelique)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 08, 2025
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 03/09 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order of Deficiency Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, March 06, 2025
2 2 order Deficiency Adversary Proceeding Thu 03/06 1:37 PM
Order of Deficiency Adversary Proceeding. Filing Fee ($350.00) Not Paid Due By 3/20/2025. (Martin, Julie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/05 12:38 PM
Adversary case 25-06004 Complaint by Christopher Sheehy against Jennifer Ellen Krom . Fee Amount $350 . AP Service Due 4/24/2025. Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) ,(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-]