Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Gretchen S Lund
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 4:25-cv-00017
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Missouri Builders Service Inc
Represented By
Michael T Graham
Thompson Coburn Llp - Chi/il
contact info
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By
Paul E Stoehr
Ledbetter Partners LLC
contact info
Rebecca J McColm
Ledbetter Partners Llc - In/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Trustees of the Roofers Local #2 Supplemental Pension Fund
Represented By
Paul E Stoehr
Ledbetter Partners LLC
contact info
Rebecca J McColm
Ledbetter Partners Llc - In/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/01 10:31 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Missouri Builders Service Inc.(Graham, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Wed 04/30 2:33 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/30 2:32 PM
ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2025 11:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 5/23/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/30/2025. (smb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
9 9 order Order Tue 04/08 4:19 PM
TEXT ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/8/2025. (smb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/31 8:42 AM
Reset Deadlines: Missouri Builders Service Inc Answer due 5/1/2025 pursuant to DE7 . (kmt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/27 3:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Missouri Builders Service Inc. (Graham, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/27 3:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, /DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC INITIAL EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (UNOPPOSED) by Defendant Missouri Builders Service Inc. (Graham, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Graham on behalf of Missouri Builders Service Inc (Graham, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/17 4:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Roofers Local #2 Supplemental Pension Fund. All Defendants. (Stoehr, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 03/06 10:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Missouri Builders Service Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/06 10:36 AM
*** NEW CASE *** Judge Gretchen S Lund and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/05 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E Stoehr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stoehr, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/05 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca J McColm on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McColm, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/05 1:38 PM
COMPLAINT against MISSOURI BUILDERS SERVICE, INC.( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5835017.), filed by Trustees of the Indiana State Council of Roofers Health and Welfare Fund, TRUSTEES OF THE ROOFERS LOCAL #2 SUPPLEMENTAL PENSION FUND.(McColm, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons