New Jersey District Court
Judge:William J Martini
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:25-cv-01651
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 5:26 AM EDT
Defendant
JAL EQUITY CORP.
Represented By
ELIZABETH ANN CARBONE
Cole Schotz PC
contact info
Plaintiff
KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC.
Represented By
PHILLIP JAMES DUFFY
Gibbons P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
14 14 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/06 12:14 PM
ORDER An initial scheduling conference shall be held via video conference on June 27, 2025 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. Microsoft Teams login credentials will be provided. The parties shall file a proposed joint discovery plan no later than five business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form joint discovery plan can be found[LINK:here] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 5/6/2025. (JB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ALAN AYES on behalf of KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC. (AYES, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
12 12 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 4:07 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by JAL EQUITY CORP.. (CARBONE, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 04/29 4:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAL EQUITY CORP.. (CARBONE, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/29 4:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, by JAL EQUITY CORP..(CARBONE, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
9 9 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 04/15 2:59 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to JAL Equity Corp.. Attorney ELIZABETH ANN CARBONE for JAL EQUITY CORP. added. (CARBONE, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH ANN CARBONE on behalf of JAL EQUITY CORP. (CARBONE, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 04/15 4:17 PM
CLERK'S TEXT ORDER -9 Application for Clerk's Order to Extend Time to Answer submitted by JAL EQUITY CORP. has been GRANTED. The new answer due date has been set for 4/29/2025. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/08 3:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC.. (DUFFY, PHILLIP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
6 6 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 3:28 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC.. (DUFFY, PHILLIP)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 03/07 2:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC. identifying Konica Minolta, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DUFFY, PHILLIP)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 3:04 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 03/06 4:56 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JAL EQUITY CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/06 4:55 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
3 3 misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 03/05 2:04 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint , specifically Exhibits A-E referenced within the Complaint by KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC.. (DUFFY, PHILLIP)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 03/05 2:01 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC. as to JAL EQUITY CORP.. (DUFFY, PHILLIP)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/05 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT against JAL EQUITY CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16065571), filed by KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC..(DUFFY, PHILLIP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/05 6:11 PM
Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams. (mfr)
Related: [-]