Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-17437

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Donald R Cassling
Case #: 1:25-ap-00078
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Terminated:May 13, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Keoisha Meeacka Johnson
666 Greenbay Ave
Calumet City, IL 60429
Represented By
Keoisha Meeacka Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Gateway Financial Solutions
PO Box 3257
Saginaw, MI 48601
Represented By
Christopher H Purcell
Sherman & Purcell, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/13 4:21 PM
Adversary Case 1:25-ap-78 Closed . (Batson, Nicole)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Agreed Order Tue 05/13 4:19 PM
Agreed Order and Judgment Order Related [+]. Signed on 5/13/2025 (Batson, Nicole)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement per Rule 9019, Motion to Dismiss Certain Counts of Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
12 12 motion Approve Compromise or Settlement per Rule 9019 Wed 04/30 3:01 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement per Rule 9019 with with Keoisha Johnson, defendant, Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Counts II of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher H Purcell on behalf of Gateway Financial Solutions. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2025 at 09:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Purcell, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation filed on April 30, 2025, docket 11
Att: 2 Proposed Order
11 11 misc Stipulation for Judgment Wed 04/30 2:57 PM
Stipulation for Judgment Filed by Christopher H Purcell on behalf of Gateway Financial Solutions. (Purcell, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 04/17 10:58 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cassling. (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 04/09 4:46 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 04/17/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Cassling, , , . (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 04/01 10:34 AM
(E)Order Denying for the Reasons Stated on the Record Motion to Dismiss Adversary Related [+] (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, March 31, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/31 9:22 AM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Keoisha Meeacka Johnson . Hearing scheduled for 4/1/2025 at 09:30 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Molina, Nilsa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
6 6 order Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion Tue 03/25 1:22 PM
Order Granting Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion Related [+]. Signed on 3/25/2025. (Hamilton, Annette)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 motion Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion Tue 03/25 11:47 AM
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion Filed by Keoisha Meeacka Johnson . (Chavez, Baldo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 crditcrd none Wed 03/05 12:35 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 25-00078 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A49203470. Fee Amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/05 11:19 AM
Summons Service Executed on Keoisha Meeacka Johnson Related [+]. (Purcell, Christopher)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 03/05 11:14 AM
Summons Issued on Keoisha Meeacka Johnson Answer Due 04/4/2025 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/05 11:14 AM
Adversary case 25-00078 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)), (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))): Complaint by Gateway Financial Solutions against Keoisha Meeacka Johnson. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 4/15/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Purcell, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet