Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00396
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 2:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Hussmann Corporation
Plaintiff
Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By
Russell J Reid
Reid Ballew & Leahy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/14 1:49 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Hussmann Corporation on 4/4/2025 Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Russell
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
5 5 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Wed 03/12 9:41 AM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
4 4 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Wed 03/12 9:40 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/11 9:26 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to Hussmann Corporation (AVC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 03/11 9:07 AM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
2 2 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 03/05 11:30 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Russell
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/05 11:29 AM
COMPLAINT To Collect Trust Funds Pursuant To Audit against defendant(s) Hussmann Corporation Related [+] Attorney Russell J Reid added to party Northwest Administrators Inc(pty:pla) filed by Northwest Administrators Inc.
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8868072id, Russell
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons In a Civil Action