11262 VENTURA LLC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Victoria S Kaufman |
Case #: | 1:25-bk-10352 |
Case Filed: | Mar 03, 2025 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 20, 2025 |
Claims Deadline: | May 12, 2025 |
Dismissed: | Mar 20, 2025 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2025 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $50,001 to $100,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
11262 VENTURA LLC
9440 Santa Monica Blvd Ste 301
Beverly Hills, CA 90210-4614 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
John-Patrick McGinnis Fritz (TR)
2818 La Cienega Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90034 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 04/10 3:53 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing the above referenced bankruptcy case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, the bond is exonerated, and this case is therefore closed. (PG) |
|
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $0.00, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Trustee John-Patrick McGinnis Fritz (TR). (Fritz (TR), John-Patrick) |
|
Saturday, March 22, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/22/2025. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 03/22/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Notice of dismissal with restriction for against debtor's refiling (BNC) (JC) |
|
21 | 21
![]() ORDER of dismissal with special restriction-period against re-filing a new bankruptcy case - Debtor Dismissed for 180 days. (BNC-PDF)Barred Debtor 11262 VENTURA LLC starting 3/20/2025 to 9/16/2025 Signed on 3/20/2025 . (JC) |
|
Wednesday, March 19, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice of UST's motion to dismiss or convert case - chapter 11 to 7 (BNC) (PG) |
|
18 | 18
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Mon 03/17 9:21 AM
Hearing Set The Hearing date is set for 4/23/2025 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Victoria S. Kaufman (PG) |
|
17 | 17
![]() U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert case under 11 U.S.C. § 1112(b); Memorandum of points and authorities; and Declaration of Maria D. Marquez in support thereof with proof of service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV). (united states trustee (kcb)) |
|
Sunday, March 09, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/09/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, March 08, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 03/08/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
court
Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Fri 03/07 1:09 PM
Hearing Set Order to Show Cause hearing to be held on 3/19/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Victoria S. Kaufman (PG) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal With A 180-Day Bar (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/7/2025 (PG) |
|
Thursday, March 06, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/31/2025 at 10:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/30/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 5/12/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/2/2025. (AG1) |
|
Tuesday, March 04, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of transfer of case (Inter/Intra District Transfer) (BNC) (AG1) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Comments- "CM/ECF Intradistrict Transfer feature used to transfer case from Los Angeles Division to San Fernando Valley Division (New Case Number Assigned: 1:25-bk-10352-VK Previous Case Number: 2:25-bk-11664-NB)." (AG1) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Order INTRA Transfer Case to Another Division from Los Angeles Division to San Fernando Division (BNC-PDF). Signed on 3/4/2025. (NV) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/20/2025 at 10:00 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999.Deadline to file a complaint objecting to discharge is the first date set for hearing on confirmation of the plan. Deadline to file a complaint to determine whether certain debts are dischargeable is 5/19/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 5/12/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/2/2025. (LL2) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Appointment of Trustee Subchapter V; Proof of Service . John-Patrick McGinnis Fritz (TR) added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). (Law, Dare) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by . (NV) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (Procedures Order) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/4/2025 . Status hearing to be held on 4/8/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason Initial Status Conference Report Due By 3/25/2025. (NV) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Order Directing debtor to appear and show cause why this case should not be dismissed based upon debtor's lack of representation by legal counsel - Hearing set for 3/18/25 at 1 p.m. in Courtroom 1545 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/4/2025 (NV) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2025 (NV) |
|
court
Case Reassigned (Manual)
Wed 03/05 12:15 PM
Judge Victoria S. Kaufman added to case. Involvement of Judge Neil W. Bason Terminated (AG1) |
||
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Tue 03/04 10:46 AM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 03/18/2025 at 01:00 PM 255 E. Temple St.Courtroom 1545Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Neil Bason (NV) |
||
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Tue 03/04 10:49 AM
Hearing Set Status Hearing to be held on 04/08/2025 at 01:00 PM 255 E. Temple St.Courtroom 1545Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Neil Bason (NV) |
||
Monday, March 03, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
court
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)
Mon 03/03 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by SC. Receipt Number 22003773. (admin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by 11262 VENTURA LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 3/17/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 3/17/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 3/17/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 3/17/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 3/17/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 3/17/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 3/17/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 3/17/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 3/17/2025. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 3/17/2025. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 3/17/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 3/17/2025. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 6/2/2025. (BT) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2025 (BT) |