Charles v. McCabe Russell, PA
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | James K Bredar |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00728 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Torts |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2025 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
McCabe Russell, PA
8171 Maple Lawn Blvd, Suite 350
Fulton, MD 20759 |
|
Plaintiff
Nathan M.F. Charles, Esq.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by McCabe Russell, PA(Viola, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued 21 days as to McCabe Russell, PA.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE by Nathan M.F. Charles, Esq. re1 Complaint (Summons) (Charles, Nathan) |
|
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 03/10 2:26 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by Nathan M.F. Charles, Esq. was filed incorrectly. ***The following attachment is missing - Summons. To correctthis problem, file Summons using the event> Other Filings >Notices > Notice (Other) and link Summons to1 Complaint. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, March 06, 2025 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/06 1:23 PM
Case Assigned to Judge James K Bredar. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, March 05, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11822405.), filed by Nathan Michael Fifer Charles.(Charles, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |