New York Eastern District Court
Judge:James R Cho
Case #: 1:25-cv-01262
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan P. Floyd
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Benson
Represented By
April Forbes
April Forbes
contact info
Pablo Esteban Bustos
Bustos & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
10 10 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 04/18 3:33 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for April 22, 2025 (on consent) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Floyd, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 04/18 4:29 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The in-person initial conference previously scheduled for 4/22/2025 is adjourned to 5/8/2025 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11D South before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for all parties must attend. Parties to submit the Proposed Scheduling Order by 5/6/2025 . Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/18/2025. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
order Order Re: Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Thu 04/17 4:33 PM
Order re: Notice of Consent to Change Attorney. Attorney Pablo Esteban Bustos is hereby substituted as counsel of record for Robert Benson, instead and in place of Attorney April Forbes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/17/2025. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 12, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Sat 04/12 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Pablo Esteban Bustos (Bustos, Pablo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Monday, March 31, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 03/31 9:35 AM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Floyd, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/17 12:51 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT to reflect that First Name of Plaintiff is Ronald and not Robert against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed by Robert Benson. (Forbes, April)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
6 6 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/13 3:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on 4/22/2025 at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11D South before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Counsel is directed to complete the attached Proposed Scheduling Order and electronically file same with the Court no later than 4/18/2025 . Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/12 5:56 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Floyd, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 4:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Floyd, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 03/07 10:31 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Fri 03/07 10:30 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (KD)
Related: [-]
notice Notice(Other) Fri 03/07 10:27 AM
NOTICE! re1 Notice of Removal, Counsel is advised to correctly file the Corporate Disclosure Statement. (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/07 10:28 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
misc ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal Fri 03/07 10:32 AM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (KD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 03/05 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 503149/2025. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18825100) (Floyd, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet