Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:25-cv-00102
Nature of Suit368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Case in other court:Allen County, Indiana Superior Court 1, 02D01-2501-CT-00057
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
General Motors
Represented By
Patrick B Healy
contact info
Movant
Travis W Royal
4126 Avondale Drive
Fort Wayne, IN 46806
Plaintiff
Vanya D Royal
representing 4217 Plaza Drive
Fort Wayne, IN 46806
Represented By
Oliver S Younge
Younge Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
16 16 motion Dismiss Mon 04/21 5:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Insufficient Service of Process by Defendant General Motors. (Healy, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
15 15 motion Intervene Thu 04/17 1:49 PM
Renewed MOTION to Intervene by Movant Travis W Royal. (ash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion to Intervene Tue 04/15 1:59 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Pursuant to the Court's Order dated 3/12/20258 , the4 Motion to Intervene is DENIED without prejudice. Text entry order. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver S Younge on behalf of Vanya D Royal (Younge, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
12 12 misc Statement Thu 03/20 1:34 PM
STATEMENT Supplemental Statement of Jurisdiction regarding7 Order,, Set Deadlines,. (Healy, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/17 4:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors. (Healy, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 03/13 3:22 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins:9 Defendant General Motors, LLC's Motion for Enlargement of Time for Its Initial Responsive Pleading is granted. Defendant granted to and including 4/19/2025 to file an answer to Plaintiff's complaint. Text entry order. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 03/13 3:24 PM
Set Deadlines: Answer due 4/19/2025 (mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 03/12 4:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Initial Responsive Pleading by Defendant General Motors.(Healy, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
8 8 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/12 2:54 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court AFFORDS Plaintiff Vanya Royal to and including 4/12/2025, to secure counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance on behalf of the estate of William Royal in this action. Failure to timely do so may result in the summary dismissal of this case. The Court also AFFORDS movant Travis Royal to and including 4/12/2025, to secure counsel and cause his counsel to file an amended motion to intervene on behalf of the estate of William Royal. Failure to timely do so may result in the summary denial of the motion to intervene4 as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 3/12/2025. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(mrm) Modified on 3/12/2025 to update title (mrm)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/12 2:47 PM
ORDER: Defendant is AFFORDED to and including 3/19/2025, to file asupplemental jurisdiction statement that adequately alleges Plaintiff's domicile as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 3/12/2025. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(mrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
6 6 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/10 2:24 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Defendant's corporate disclosure statement3 is not compliant with FRCP 7.1 and General Order 2023-06. Defendant is ordered to file an amended corporate disclosure statement on or before 3/17/2025. Text entry order. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mr)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice - Other Mon 03/10 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Pro Se Representation and Request for Direct Payment by Travis W Royal. (ash)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Intervene Mon 03/10 1:36 PM
MOTION to Intervene by Movant Travis W Royal.(ash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/06 11:21 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors identifying Corporate Parent General Motors LLC for General Motors.. (Healy, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 03/05 3:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5835220.) from Allen County, IN Superior Court 1, Cause No. 02D01-2501-CT-00057, filed by General Motors, LLC.(Healy, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/06 9:30 AM
Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
2 2 cmp State Court Complaint Thu 03/06 9:28 AM
(unsigned) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against General Motors, Allen County, Indiana Superior Court 1, 02D01-2501-CT-00057, filed by Vanya D Royal.(mrm) Modified on 3/6/2025 to advise unsigned (mrm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit