California Central District Court
Judge:Serena R Murillo
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:25-cv-00425
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 2:07 AM PDT
Defendant
Doug Cirbo
Represented By
Alexander Michael Brand
Best Best And Krieger LLP
contact info
Defendant
City of Lake Forest
Represented By
Alexander Michael Brand
Best Best And Krieger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert Pequeno
Represented By
Alexander Michael Brand
Best Best And Krieger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Debra Rose
Represented By
Alexander Michael Brand
Best Best And Krieger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark Tettemer
Represented By
Alexander Michael Brand
Best Best And Krieger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scott Voigts
Represented By
Alexander Michael Brand
Best Best And Krieger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin Yu
Represented By
Alexander Michael Brand
Best Best And Krieger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Brian McMillan
Represented By
Raquel Flyer
Flyer And Flyer Aplc
contact info
David R Flyer
Flyer And Flyer Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
33 33 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 04/23 11:09 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Doug Cirbo, Mark Tettemer, Scott Voigts, Robert Pequeno, Benjamin Yu, Debra Rose, City of Lake Forest in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 04/23 9:32 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Serena R. Murillo: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/14/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2025 at 2:00 p.m. (mku)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
31 31 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Wed 04/16 8:23 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Robert Pequeno, Debra Rose, Mark Tettemer, Scott Voigts, Benjamin Yu, Doug Cirbo, City of Lake Forest. Motion set for hearing on 7/3/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Serena R. Murillo. (Attorney Alexander Michael Brand added to party Robert Pequeno(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Michael Brand added to party Debra Rose(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Michael Brand added to party Mark Tettemer(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Michael Brand added to party Scott Voigts(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Michael Brand added to party Benjamin Yu(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Michael Brand added to party Doug Cirbo(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Michael Brand added to party City of Lake Forest(pty:dft)) (Brand, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Declaration of Evelyn Blanco in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Evelyn Blanco in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Evelyn Blanco in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Evelyn Blanco in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Evelyn Blanco in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Evelyn Blanco in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Evelyn Blanco in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint,
Att: 9 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint,
Att: 10 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint
Thursday, March 27, 2025
30 30 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 03/27 11:33 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only28 , Summons Issued,,29 , Amended Complaint/Petition26 served on 03/27/2025. (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
29 29 service Summons Issued Wed 03/26 6:01 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint26 as to Defendants Doug Cirbo, City of Lake Forest, Robert Pequeno, Debra Rose, Mark Tettemer, Scott Voigts, Benjamin Yu.. (jp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon issued on 1st AC as to Mark Tettemer,
Att: 2 Summon issued on 1st AC as to Scott Volgts,
Att: 3 Summon issued on 1st AC as to Robert Pequeno,
Att: 4 Summon issued on 1st AC as to Benjamin Yu,
Att: 5 Summon issued on 1st AC as to Debra Rose,
Att: 6 Summon issued on 1st AC as to City of Lake Forest
28 28 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/26 10:29 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Serena R. Murillo. (mku)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
27 27 notice Summons Request Tue 03/25 12:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition26 filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan.(Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons on FAC Mark Tettemer,
Att: 2 Summons on FAC Scott Voigts,
Att: 3 Summons on FAC Robert Pequeno,
Att: 4 Summons on FAC Benjamin Yu,
Att: 5 Summons on FAC Debra Rose,
Att: 6 Summons on FAC City of Lake Forest
26 26 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 03/25 11:45 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan(Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
25 25 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 03/24 3:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan, re Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening),22 of Amended Summonses served on 03/21/2025. (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 03/24 2:32 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan, upon Defendant Doug Cirbo served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025; Robert Pequeno served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025; Debra Rose served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025; Mark Tettemer served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025; Scott Voigts served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025; Benjamin Yu served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Doug Cirbo, Mark Tettemer, Scott Voigts, Robert Pequeno, Benjamin Yu, Debra Rose in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy(Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service Mark Tettemer,
Att: 2 Proof of Service Scott Voigts,
Att: 3 Proof of Service Robert Pequeno,
Att: 4 Proof of Service Benjamin Yu,
Att: 5 Proof of Service Debra Rose
23 23 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 03/24 2:21 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan, upon Defendant City of Lake Forest served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Thy Merritt, Assistant City Clerk in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
22 22 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/21 9:25 AM
AMENDED 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Doug Cirbo, City of Lake Forest, Robert Pequeno, Debra Rose, Mark Tettemer, Scott Voigts, Benjamin Yu. (jp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon issued as to Mark Tettemer,
Att: 2 Summon issued as to Scott Volgts,
Att: 3 Summon issued as to Robert Pequeno,
Att: 4 Summon issued as to Benjamin Yu,
Att: 5 Summon issued as to Debra Rose,
Att: 6 Summon issued as to City of Lake Forest
Monday, March 17, 2025
21 21 notice Summons Request Mon 03/17 3:44 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)20 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)17 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)15 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)18 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)14 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)16 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)19 filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan.(Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Summons Mark Tettemer,
Att: 2 Amended Summons Scott Voigts,
Att: 3 Amended Summons Robert Pequeno,
Att: 4 Amended Summons Benjamin Yu,
Att: 5 Amended Summons Debra Rose,
Att: 6 Amended Summons City of Lake Forest
Friday, March 07, 2025
20 20 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/07 6:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Doug Cirbo. (car)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/07 6:14 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Mark Tettemer. (car)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/07 6:12 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Scott Voigts. (car)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/07 6:10 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Robert Pequeno. (car)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/07 6:09 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Benjamin Yu. (car)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/07 6:08 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Debra Rose. (car)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/07 6:07 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant City of Lake Forest. (car)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/07 5:42 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
12 12 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/07 5:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/07 5:41 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Serena R Murillo and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
10 10 notice Summons Request Wed 03/05 2:48 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan. (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Summons Request Wed 03/05 2:45 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan. (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Summons Request Wed 03/05 2:42 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan. (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Summons Request Wed 03/05 2:38 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan. (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Subpoena Request (AO 88) Summons Request Wed 03/05 2:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan., Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan. (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Wed 03/05 2:23 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan. (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 03/05 2:19 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan. (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/05 1:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan, identifying Brian McMillan, Doug Cirbo, Mark Tettemer, Scott Voigts, Robert Pequeno, Benjamin Yu, Debra Rose, City of Lake Forest. (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 03/05 1:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan. (Flyer, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/05 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39235251 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Brian McMillan. (Attorney David R Flyer added to party Brian McMillan(pty:pla))(Flyer, David)
Related: [-]