Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Kristi K Dubose
Referred: P Bradley Murray
Case #: 1:25-cv-00090
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1338 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 3:45 AM CDT
Defendant
Avona Fertility Inc.
Defendant
Alice Crisci
Represented By
Allen E. Graham
contact info
Grace Williams
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
Innomed Seven LLC
Represented By
Brian P. McCarthy
Mcdowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.
contact info
Zachary A Madonia
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Defendant
Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC
Represented By
Brian P. McCarthy
Mcdowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.
contact info
Zachary A Madonia
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Defendant
Medanswers, Inc.
Represented By
Allen E. Graham
contact info
Grace Williams
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ovum Health, Inc.
Represented By
Allen E. Graham
contact info
Grace Williams
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ovum Medical, LLC
Represented By
Allen E. Graham
contact info
Grace Williams
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
Deneen Plessala
Represented By
Brian P. McCarthy
Mcdowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.
contact info
Zachary A Madonia
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Defendant
Kirby Plessala
Represented By
Brian P. McCarthy
Mcdowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.
contact info
Zachary A Madonia
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Defendant
Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC
Represented By
Brian P. McCarthy
Mcdowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.
contact info
Zachary A Madonia
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Plaintiff
Carla Falkner
Represented By
Thomas H. Benton, Jr.
Speegle Hoffman Holman & Holifield, Llcl
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Falkner
Represented By
Thomas H. Benton, Jr.
Speegle Hoffman Holman & Holifield, Llcl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
35 35 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 04/22 10:02 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting34 Joint Motion to Continue Rule 26 Meeting Report: The deadline to file the Rule 26 Meeting Report is suspended until the Court issues a ruling on the pending Motion to Remand and Motion to Dismiss. In the event the Motion to Remand and the Motion to Dismiss are denied, the parties shall file their Rule 26 Meeting Report within 7 days of the denial of the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/22/2025.(aws)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 04/22 9:41 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:34 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 26 Meeting Report . Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
34 34 motion Continue Mon 04/21 4:12 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 26 Meeting Report filed by Innomed Seven LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Deneen Plessala, Kirby Plessala, Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/11 4:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION to Remand filed by Alice Crisci, Medanswers, Inc., Ovum Medical, LLC. (Williams, Grace)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/11 2:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION to Remand filed by Innomed Seven LLC, Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Fri 04/11 3:30 PM
REFERRAL OF32 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Fri 04/11 4:38 PM
REFERRAL OF33 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
31 31 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 03/28 11:43 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Motion to Continue (Doc. 29) re response to Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 10, 11). Parties will be advised of a new briefing schedule if the pending Motion to Remand (Doc. 27) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/28/2025. (aws)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing Fri 03/28 11:38 AM
Order Setting Deadlines re:27 MOTION to Remand filed by Carla Falkner, Peter Falkner. Responses due by 4/11/2025. Reply due by 4/18/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/28/2025. (aws)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Fri 03/28 8:22 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:27 MOTION to Remand ,29 MOTION to Continue Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (jmr)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Fri 03/28 8:25 AM
REFERRAL OF28 Brief to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (jmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
29 29 motion Continue Thu 03/27 8:16 PM
MOTION to Continue filed by Carla Falkner, Peter Falkner. (Benton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Brief Thu 03/27 8:15 PM
Brief filed by Carla Falkner, Peter Falkner re27 MOTION to Remand filed by Carla Falkner, Peter Falkner. (Benton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Remand Thu 03/27 8:13 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by Carla Falkner, Peter Falkner. (Benton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
26 26 order Order - Document NOTED Mon 03/17 10:43 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement12 filed by MedAnswers, Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement13 filed by Ovum Medical, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement18 filed by Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement20 filed by Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement,24 filed by InnoMed Seven, LLC. Review of the corporate disclosure statements has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lhm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
25 25 order Order - Document NOTED Fri 03/14 12:29 PM
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement24 filed by Innomed Seven LLC reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (aws)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/14 12:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Innomed Seven LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Kirby Plessala, Deneen Plessala identifying Other Affiliate Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate Kirby Plessala, Other Affiliate Deneen Plessala for Innomed Seven LLC.. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order Fri 03/14 11:28 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Innomed Seven, LLC19 is hereby STRICKEN. Defendant must refile its statement to also identify in section 3 any members of Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC and any other members of reportable LLCs until ownership by natural persons or corporate entities are identifed. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/14/2025. (aws)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order - Document NOTED Fri 03/14 11:18 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement20 filed by Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (aws)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order - Document NOTED Fri 03/14 11:15 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement18 filed by Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (aws)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 4:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC, Kirby Plessala identifying Other Affiliate Kirby Plessala for Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC.. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 4:25 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Innomed Seven LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC for Innomed Seven LLC.. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 4:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Kirby Plessala, Deneen Plessala identifying Other Affiliate Kirby Plessala, Other Affiliate Deneen Plessala for Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC.. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing Thu 03/13 3:30 PM
Order Setting Motion Deadline re:10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC, Deneen Plessala, Kirby Plessala, Innomed Seven LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC and11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ovum Medical, LLC, Alice Crisci, Medanswers, Inc. Responses due by 3/27/2025. Replies due by 4/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/13/2025. (aws)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order - Document NOTED Thu 03/13 3:20 PM
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement13 filed by Ovum Medical, LLC reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (aws)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order - Document NOTED Thu 03/13 3:19 PM
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement12 filed by Medanswers, Inc. reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (aws)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Thu 03/13 2:48 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Corporate Disclosure Statements (Docs. 6, 7, and 8) filed by Defendants are hereby STRICKEN. Defendants are ORDERED to refile their Disclosure Statements listing the members of the reportable LLCs in section 3 of the form by March 20, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/13/2025. (aws)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 2:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Ovum Medical, LLC. (Williams, Grace)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/13 2:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Medanswers, Inc.. (Williams, Grace)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 03/13 11:19 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:10 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings . Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
11 11 motion Dismiss Wed 03/12 5:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Alice Crisci, Medanswers, Inc., Ovum Medical, LLC. (Williams, Grace)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Wed 03/12 5:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Innomed Seven LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Deneen Plessala, Kirby Plessala, Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation of Settlement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Plessala Patent,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Plessala Action Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Murphy Action Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - ASEC's Cease and Desist Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
9 9 order Preliminary Scheduling Order Fri 03/07 5:23 PM
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/7/2025. (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 3:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Innomed Seven LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC for Innomed Seven LLC.. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 3:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 3:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
5 5 misc Consent to Motion Thu 03/06 1:14 PM
Consent to MOTION [Notice of Consent to Removal] filed by Deneen Plessala, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Kirby Plessala. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent to Motion Thu 03/06 10:50 AM
Consent to MOTION Notice of Consent to Removal filed by Ovum Medical, LLC, Alice Crisci, Ovum Health, Inc., Medanswers, Inc.. (Graham, Allen)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/06 8:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. McCarthy on behalf of Innomed Seven LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Deneen Plessala, Kirby Plessala, Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC (McCarthy, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/05 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A Madonia on behalf of Innomed Seven LLC, Innovative Medicine Partners, LLC, Deneen Plessala, Kirby Plessala, Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 03/05 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405, Receipt number AALSDC-3573897, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Innomed Seven LLC, Plessala Gynecology & Fertility, PLLC. (Madonia, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Stipulation of Settlement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet