Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:25-cv-00262
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:02 AM CDT
Defendant
Tractor Supply Company
Plaintiff
William Matthew Schofield
Represented By
J. Russ Bryant
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
John Joseph Leatherwood, IV
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant
contact info
Gordon E. Jackson
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info
Joshua Dixon Autry
Jackson Shields Yeiser Holt Owen & Bryant (memphis)
contact info


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/06 3:56 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/6/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Wed 03/05 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 5/30/2025 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ch)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Wed 03/05 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ch)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 03/05 2:10 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ch)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Wed 03/05 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ch)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/05 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Tractor Supply Company (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4273056), filed by William Matthew Schofield.(ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join,
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 03/05 2:12 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Russ Bryant, Gordon E. Jackson, John Joseph Leatherwood, IV, and Joshua Dixon Autry admitted to this court . (ch)
Related: [-]