California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:25-cv-00597
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 2:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Launcelot A Devault
Defendant
David Ndalamba
Defendant
Secret Waterfall LLC
Defendant
Starline Media, Inc.
Defendant
Tarah A Uhrich
Plaintiff
Rainbow S.p.A.
Represented By
Bradford G Hughes
Clark Hill LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
13 13 1 pgs notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Tue 03/25 7:52 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of case from Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani to Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:25-cv-00597-MRA(DTBx). (ap)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
12 12 1 pgs misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Mon 03/24 6:06 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Rainbow S.p.A..(Hughes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs AO 121, Form 8A,
Att: 2 1 pgs AO 121, Form 9A,
Att: 3 AO 121, Form 10A,
Att: 4 AO 121, Form 11A,
Att: 5 AO 121, Form 12A,
Att: 6 AO 121, Form 13A,
Att: 7 AO 121, Form 14A,
Att: 8 AO 121, Form 15A
11 11 375 pgs othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 03/24 5:46 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiff Rainbow S.p.A.(Hughes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 30 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 14 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 11 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Thursday, March 20, 2025
10 10 textonly MJDAP Timely Opt-Out Fri 03/21 4:10 PM
Declination of Consent form received on 03/20/2025 was submitted within deadline set forth in L.R. 73-2.1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. Related [+] TEXT ONLY ENTRY
Related: [-] c
Monday, March 10, 2025
9 9 1 pgs misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Mon 03/10 4:06 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Rainbow S.p.A..(Hughes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AO 121, Form 2,
Att: 2 AO 121, Form 3,
Att: 3 AO 121, Form 4,
Att: 4 AO 121, Form 5,
Att: 5 AO 121, Form 6,
Att: 6 AO 121, Form 7,
Att: 7 AO 121, Form 8,
Att: 8 AO 121, Form 9,
Att: 9 AO 121, Form 10,
Att: 10 AO 121, Form 11,
Att: 11 AO 121, Form 12,
Att: 12 AO 121, Form 13,
Att: 13 AO 121, Form 14,
Att: 14 AO 121, Form 15
8 8 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Mon 03/10 3:56 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Rainbow S.p.A.. (Hughes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
7 7 1 pgs notice Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form Fri 03/07 2:39 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/07 2:38 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Launcelot A Devault, David Ndalamba, Secret Waterfall LLC, Starline Media, Inc., Tarah A Uhrich. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Fri 03/07 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/05 5:54 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Rainbow S.p.A. (Hughes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Summons Request Wed 03/05 5:53 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Rainbow S.p.A.. (Hughes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 03/05 5:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rainbow S.p.A.. (Hughes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
1 1 375 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/05 5:46 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39238821 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Rainbow S.p.A.. (Attorney Bradford G Hughes added to party Rainbow S.p.A.(pty:pla))(Hughes, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 48 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 14 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 11 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 4 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 9 7 pgs Exhibit I,
Att: 10 5 pgs Exhibit J