District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Randolph D Moss
Case #: 1:25-cv-00651
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
ALISSA L. EMMEL
Defendant
KRISTI NOEM
Defendant
KIKA SCOTT
Defendant
U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Plaintiff
PHU QUOC DIEP
Represented By
Brian Scott Green
Law Office Of Brian Green
contact info
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TUAN QUANG LE
Represented By
Brian Scott Green
Law Office Of Brian Green
contact info
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HA THI NGAN PHAM
Represented By
Brian Scott Green
Law Office Of Brian Green
contact info
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HANG THI BICH PHAN
Represented By
Brian Scott Green
Law Office Of Brian Green
contact info
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HIEN THI TRAN
Represented By
Brian Scott Green
Law Office Of Brian Green
contact info
H. Ronald Klasko
Klasko Immigration Law Partners, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 06, 2025
4 4 order .Order Thu 03/06 7:13 PM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/6/2025. (lcrdm1)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 03/06 9:26 AM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/06 9:21 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/05 9:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Scott Green on behalf of HANG THI BICH PHAN, TUAN QUANG LE, HA THI NGAN PHAM, HIEN THI TRAN, PHU QUOC DIEP (Green, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/05 9:27 PM
COMPLAINT for Administrative Procedure Act Relief or for Writ of Mandamus against ALISSA L. EMMEL, KRISTI NOEM, KIKA SCOTT, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11522870) filed by HA THI NGAN PHAM, TUAN QUANG LE, HANG THI BICH PHAN, HIEN THI TRAN, PHU QUOC DIEP.(Klasko, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-G,
Att: 3 Summons Summons for Alissa Emmel,
Att: 4 Summons Summons for Civil Process Clerk,
Att: 5 Summons Summons for Kika Scott,
Att: 6 Summons Summons for Kristi Noem,
Att: 7 Summons Summons for Pam Bondi,
Att: 8 Summons Summons for USCIS