Maryland District Court
Judge:Paula Xinis
Case #: 8:25-cv-00706
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
KBR Inc.
Represented By
Lauren M Upton
Shulman Rogers PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Raley
Represented By
Stephanie Lynn Rapp-Tully
Tully Rinckey, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 05/05 3:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and to Compel Arbitration by KBR Inc.(Upton, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint and to Compel Arbitration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Wendy Appel,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/14 12:18 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING as MOOT6 Motion for Extension of Time; GRANTING8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Answer or otherwise Response to the Complaint is EXTENDED to May 5, 2025. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/14/2025. (tb2s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/09 3:53 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint (Unopposed) by KBR Inc.(Upton, Lauren) Modified on 4/9/2025 (hmls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/31 12:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Raley. KBR Inc. served on 3/10/2025, answer due 3/31/2025.(Rapp-Tully, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/31 11:41 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by KBR Inc..(Upton, Lauren) Modified on 3/31/2025 (hmls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M Upton on behalf of KBR Inc. (Upton, Lauren)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 03/31 8:53 AM
QC NOTICE:3 Affidavit of Service filed by Robert Raley was filed incorrectly. **Please refile affidavit under the "Service of Process" category, select the "Summons Returned Executed" event, and enter the service date when requested. It has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/28 10:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Resident Agent on March 10, 2025, filed by Robert Raley.(Rapp-Tully, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 03/05 11:27 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to KBR Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/05 11:16 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 26 pgs COMPLAINT against KBR Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11817552.), filed by Robert Raley.(Rapp-Tully, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons