Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Jennifer C Boal
Case #: 1:25-cv-10535
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 5:19 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Stavvy, Inc.
Represented By
Philip K. Chen
Fish & Richardson, P.C. (bos)
contact info
Counter Defendant
Secure Ink LLC
Represented By
Christopher E. Hanba
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Stavvy, Inc.
Represented By
Philip K. Chen
Fish & Richardson, P.C. (bos)
contact info
Plaintiff
Secure Ink LLC
Represented By
Christopher E. Hanba
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/31 10:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Secure Ink LLC.(Hanba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/28 9:26 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stavvy, Inc.. (Chen, Philip)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 03/28 9:25 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES , COUNTERCLAIM against Secure Ink LLC by Stavvy, Inc..(Chen, Philip)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip K. Chen on behalf of Stavvy, Inc. (Chen, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 03/06 9:21 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (NMC)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Thu 03/06 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are required to submit a form indicating whether the parties consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. The parties are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (CEH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 misc Proposed Documents Submitted to the Court Wed 03/05 10:21 PM
Proposed Document(s) submitted by Secure Ink LLC. Document received: Proposed Summons. (Hanba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Report on the filing of patent/trademark case Wed 03/05 10:21 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Hanba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/05 10:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Secure Ink LLC. (Hanba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/05 10:19 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Stavvy, Inc. Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10874924 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Secure Ink LLC.(Hanba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent 8,442,920,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Claim Chart - '920 Patent,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Category Form