Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Briones
Case #: 3:25-cv-00080
Nature of Suit423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Case in other court:El Paso County - County Court at Law #6, 2023DTX0112
Last checked: Saturday Apr 19, 2025 4:46 AM CDT
Defendant
El Paso Central Appraisal District
Plaintiff
Conn Appliances, Inc,
Represented By
Jeri Leigh Miller
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Duston K. McFaul
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 6:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph T. Longoria. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge David Briones. (em)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/29 2:36 PM
Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Emily Valdez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20112293) by on behalf of Joseph Longoria. (Valdez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
12 12 misc Certified Mailing Wed 04/09 9:51 AM
Certified Mailing to Joseph Longoria of11 Order to file an Application for Attorney Admission. (em)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/08 6:14 PM
ORDER directing Attorney Joseph T. Longoria to file an application for admission by 4/28/25 and amend his Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Further directives incorporated in this Order. Signed by Judge David Briones. (em)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/25 4:23 PM
ORDER DENYING9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph T. Longoria. Signed by Judge David Briones. (em)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/18 3:08 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Emily Valdez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19928313) by on behalf of Melissa E. Valdez.(Valdez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/12 12:30 PM
CORRECTED ORDER DENYING STATE COURT MOTIONS. Order replaces previous Order, Doc.#6. Signed by Judge David Briones. (em)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/11 4:13 PM
ORDER TO COMPLY WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26 AND LOCAL COURT RULE CV-16. Signed by Judge David Briones. (em)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/11 4:11 PM
ORDER denying pending motions before the state court. Signed by Judge David Briones. (em)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 service Certificate of Service Mon 03/10 4:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Conn Appliances, Inc, (Miller, Jeri)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 4 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Fri 03/07 2:58 PM
Pro Hac Vice Letter as to Carmen B. Hegeman. (ep1)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Fri 03/07 2:56 PM
Pro Hac Vice Letter as to Joseph T. Longoria. (ep1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
2 2 misc Supplement to Thu 03/06 11:12 AM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal Supplement to JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet by Conn Appliances, Inc,. (Miller, Jeri)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 03/05 6:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Conn Appliances, Inc, (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19874718), filed by Conn Appliances, Inc,.(Miller, Jeri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/07 3:00 PM
Case assigned to Judge David Briones. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ep1)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to EP Mag Judge Fri 03/07 3:01 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (ep1)
Related: [-]