Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-04684
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 06, 2025 12:37 AM MST
Defendant
Jose Maria Torres-Navarrete (1)
Represented By
Alejandro Esteban Munoz
Munoz Law Firm PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/06/2025 2:26 AM MST
Friday, February 28, 2025
Arrest of Jose Maria Torres-Navarrete on 2/28/2025. (JRW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Maria Torres-Navarrete. (JRW)
Related: [-]