Nebraska District Court
Case #: 8:25-mj-00136
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2025
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 06, 2025 1:15 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Martin J. Conboy, IV
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Omaha
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Patricia Joanne Lawson (1)
Terminated: 03/05/2025
Represented By
Yvonne D. Sosa
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Omaha
contact info

GPO Mar 05 2025
ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL - The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nebraska is appointed to represent the defendant in this matter as to defendant Patricia Joanne Lawson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP)
GPO Mar 05 2025
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Patricia Joanne Lawson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
GPO Mar 05 2025
RULE 5 ORDER as to defendant Patricia Joanne Lawson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
GPO Mar 05 2025
ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTION ACT as to defendant Patricia Joanne Lawson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (E-mailed to USDC-South Dakota)(SLP)

Docket last updated: 03/06/2025 2:45 AM CST
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
1 1 RULE 5 COMPLAINT - OUT (COPY OF SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT from USDC-South Dakota 4:24cr40039) ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT.as to defendant Patricia Joanne Lawson. (TCL) (TCL). Modified on 3/4/2025 to add text and sealed attachment(TCL).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/4/2025) Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 (3/4/2025) Warrant
2 2 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING as to defendant Patricia Joanne Lawson. Initial Appearance set for 3/5/2025 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
Related: [-]