New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric R Komitee
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:25-cv-01289
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Roach & Murtha Attorneys at Law, PC
Represented By
Robert L. Arleo
Robert L. Arleo, Esq., P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mindy Weber
Represented By
Rami Salim
Stein Saks PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
10 10 misc Letter Mon 04/21 5:55 PM
Letter Response to Defendants Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Mindy Weber (Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 misc Letter Mon 04/14 4:10 PM
Letter requesting pre-motion conference for purpose of obtaining permission to file a motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Roach & Murtha Attorneys at Law, PC (Arleo, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/14 4:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roach & Murtha Attorneys at Law, PC (Arleo, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Arleo on behalf of Roach & Murtha Attorneys at Law, PC (aty to be noticed) (Arleo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/01 1:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mindy Weber. Roach & Murtha Attorneys at Law, PC served on 3/27/2025, answer due 4/17/2025. (Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 03/12 10:16 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 03/12 10:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Roach & Murtha Attorneys at Law, PC. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 03/12 10:11 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/12 9:04 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Mindy Weber (Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/12 10:10 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/11 9:26 AM
FINAL NOTICE! Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit a completed Civil Cover Sheet answering all questions ***On The NY-E of Business Rule 1(d)(3) Specifically Question (2)On The Second Page. (KD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/07 10:47 AM
Notice: Re: Incomplete Second Page of the Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please answer New York E Division of Business Rule 1(D)(3) Question # 2 then resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 9:25 AM
COMPLAINT against Roach & Murtha Attorneys at Law, PC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18826674 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Mindy Weber. (Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit a,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons