Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Charlene Edwards Honeywel
Referred: Natalie Hirt Adams
Case #: 8:25-cv-00535
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 6:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Ruebarue LLC
Represented By
Edward B. Carlstedt
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Melany Hernandez
Ford Harrison, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Jennings
Represented By
Kyle James Lee
Lee Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
14 14 misc Case Management Report Wed 05/07 4:03 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Lee, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
13 13 minutes Case Management Conference Thu 05/01 2:34 PM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/1/2025. (digital) (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 04/22 2:35 PM
NOTICE of hearing: IDEAL Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2025 at 02:00 PM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. The Court will send a Zoom invitation to the parties via e-mail prior to the hearing. At the Conference, the Court will discuss the IDEAL Program Policies and the parties' scheduling and case management needs. (CJF) Modified text on 4/22/2025 (MCB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of appearance Mon 04/14 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melany Hernandez on behalf of Ruebarue LLC (Hernandez, Melany)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 04/14 4:46 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Ruebarue LLC. (Carlstedt, Edward)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 04/14 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward B. Carlstedt on behalf of Ruebarue LLC. Lead Counsel: Edward B. Carlstedt. (Carlstedt, Edward)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/14 4:43 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Ruebarue LLC.(Carlstedt, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 service Summons returned executed Tue 03/25 11:09 AM
RETURN of service executed on 03/24/2025 by Michael Jennings as to Ruebarue LLC. (Lee, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Tue 03/18 8:47 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (CDR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 03/10 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kyle James Lee on behalf of Michael Jennings. Lead Counsel: Kyle J. Lee. (Lee, Kyle)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/10 10:55 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kyle James Lee of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JVC)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Mon 03/10 10:54 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Ruebarue LLC. (JVC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/06 3:15 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:25-cv-00535-CEH-NHA. (AA)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 10:20 AM
COMPLAINT against Ruebarue LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23096532) filed by Michael Jennings.(Lee, Kyle) Modified text on 3/6/2025 (AA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons