Buckley v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Amanda Maxfield Green |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00284 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION RECORD filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Koebcke, Kelli) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Kelli Jo Koebcke on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Koebcke, Kelli) |
|
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to; granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 3/11/2025. (rb) |
|
Thursday, March 06, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() MOTION for Leave Relief from Rule LCvR83.3 Requiring Association With Local Counsel by Amanda Buckley.(Konoski, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan M Konoski on behalf of Amanda Buckley (Konoski, Bryan) |
|
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amanda Buckley. (rp) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Amanda Buckley.(rp) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |