Montana District Court
Judge:Kathleen L Desoto
Case #: 9:25-cv-00034
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 3:42 AM MDT
Defendant
Montana Department of Environmental Quality
Represented By
Dale R. Cockrell
Moore, Cockrell, Goicoechea & Johnson, P.C
contact info
Defendant
United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By
Mark Steger Smith
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Billings
contact info
Plaintiff
Leslie Sterling
1188 Berne Rd.
Columbia Falls, MT 59912
Plaintiff
Lucas Sterling
1188 Berne Rd
Columbia Falls, MT 59912


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/30 11:44 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Smith, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Vacating - MT Thu 04/17 1:48 PM
Order Vacating preliminary pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/17/2025. (TXB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
12 12 respm Pro Se Response to Motion - MT Wed 04/16 1:04 PM
Pro Se Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss by Leslie Sterling, Lucas Sterling (Sterling, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Letter of Intent,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Steven Merritt Response
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Mon 04/14 2:43 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Smith, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kenneth A. Redden
10 10 motion Dismiss - SDM Mon 04/14 2:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Mark Steger Smith appearing for Defendant United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Smith, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of State Court File Received Fri 04/11 2:55 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED from Montana Eleventh Judicial District Court, Flathead County, case number DV 15-2025 0000322-DS. USB with exhibits uploaded to records drive. USB delivered to chambers. (SGN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
8 8 3 pgs order Order Setting - MT Mon 04/07 4:48 PM
Order Setting: Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/12/2025. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/12/2025. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/12/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2025 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. A copy of this order has been mailed to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/7/2025. (HMJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
7 7 misc Clerk's Notice of Assignment to USMJ - MT Fri 04/04 8:17 AM
Clerk's Notice of Assignment to USMJ. Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1 and no objection having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. (APP)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
6 6 notice Pro Se Registration Form Mon 03/24 8:36 AM
PRO SE REGISTRATION FORM by Plaintiffs Leslie Sterling, Lucas Sterling. (SGN)
Related: [-]
utility Pro Se PACER Approval Mon 03/24 8:38 AM
REMARK: E-filing request approved and sent to PACER for Plaintiff Lucas Sterling. (SGN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/10 3:13 PM
STATE COURT PLEADINGS (APP)
Related: [-]
4 4 24 pgs cmp Complaint - SDM Mon 03/10 3:12 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lucas Sterling, Leslie Sterling. (APP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 notice Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT Thu 03/06 2:41 PM
Service of Notification of Assignment to Magistrate Judge form. Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/24/2025. (APP)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Opening - MT Thu 03/06 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re1 Notice of Removal. Mailed to Plaintiffs with docket sheet and forms (TAG)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal - SDM Thu 03/06 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Environmental Protection Agency from Montana Eleventh Judicial District Court, Flathead County, case number DV-25-322. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Filings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet