Minnesota District Court
Judge:Nancy E Brasel
Case #: 0:25-mc-00011
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
4 4 order Order/Notice to Attorney Tue 03/11 11:09 AM
ORDER. Upon review, the Court grants Moores request, directs the Clerk to open a new civil case, and orders that the case be randomly assigned to a district judge and magistrate judge per standard District procedures. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 3/11/2025.(KMW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 misc Letter to District Judge Thu 03/06 1:29 PM
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Mariama Moore. (jam)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP) Thu 03/06 1:28 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mariama Moore. (jam)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 1:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Model Cities filed by Mariama Moore. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil Miscellaneous list. (jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet