Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-15251

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:25-ap-01092
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
First Orion Corp.
Represented By
First Orion Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
Simon E. Rodriguez, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Kevin S. Neiman
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Thu 04/24 1:38 PM
Order Granting Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; First Orion Corp. shall have an extension through and including May 26, 2025 of the time in which it is required to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. First Orion Corp. Answer or other response due 5/26/2025 Related [+]. (pt)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Wed 04/23 8:56 AM
Second Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Jonathan Dickey on behalf of First Orion Corp. Related [+]. (Dickey, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Thu 04/03 11:29 AM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint. First Orion Corp. Answer Due 5/5/2025 Related [+]. (sd)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
5 5 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 04/01 10:41 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extension of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint Filed by Jonathan Dickey on behalf of First Orion Corp. Related [+]. (Dickey, Jonathan) Modified on 4/1/2025 (sd)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 03/05 4:47 PM
Summons Service Executed On: First Orion Corp. and Samuel R. Baxter; 3/5/25 Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Simon E. Rodriguez. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 03/05 3:29 PM
Summons Issued on First Orion Corp. Answer Due 04/4/2025. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Wed 03/05 3:28 PM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/05 3:28 PM
Adversary case 25-01092 Complaint by Simon E. Rodriguez against First Orion Corp.. Fee to be Deferred. Adversary Status Deadline 06/3/2025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Neiman, Kevin)
Related: [-]