Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Liburdi
Case #: 2:25-cv-00758
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 4:26 AM MST
Defendant
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By
Brock Jason Heathcotte
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Prasad
Represented By
Joshua William Carden
Carden Livesay Limited
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 04/23 5:33 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference is set for 6/11/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Michael T Liburdi. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 4/23/2025. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/09 9:46 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Heathcotte, Brock)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
6 6 service Service Executed Thu 03/27 11:50 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stephanie Prasad: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons to U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Availability of a U.S. Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, Exhibits A-C upon EEOC on March 17, 2025.(Carden, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Rule 4(i)(2) Service Via Certified Mail
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
5 5 service Service Executed Tue 03/25 8:40 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stephanie Prasad: Certificate of Service re: SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION to U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION, CIVIL COVER SHEET, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION, EXHIBITS A-C upon EEOC c/o US Attorney's Office, Phoenix on March 10, 2025. (Carden, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 03/07 6:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
3 3 service Summons Submitted Thu 03/06 4:07 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Stephanie Prasad. (Carden, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Opened Thu 03/06 12:58 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24049397. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-00758 PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 12:57 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24049397 filed by Stephanie Prasad. (submitted by Joshua Carden)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet