Anomaly v. Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc. et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | John F Robbenhaar |
Referred: | Steven C Yarbrough |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00233 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 5:42 AM MDT |
Defendant
John Doe 1
|
|
Defendant
Simon Hughes
|
|
Defendant
Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trent Toulouse
|
|
Defendant
Larry Will
|
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Anomaly
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
John Doe 2
Terminated: 03/27/2025
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Summons Issued on Amended Complaint as to John Doe 1, Simon Hughes, Trent Toulouse, Larry Will. (jg) | ||
Monday, March 31, 2025 | ||
Summons Issued as to Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc.. (dr) | ||
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 06, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) | |
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9819657 re1 Complaint filed by Jonathan Anomaly (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Cress, Aaron) | ||
United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (eh) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) |