District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Trevor N Mcfadden
Case #: 1:25-cv-00665
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
KELLY KRUG
Plaintiff
JOSEPH J. SHELTON
Represented By
Richard Griffin
Bredhoff & Kaiser, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 03/21 4:50 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KELLY KRUG served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025 (Griffin, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 03/21 4:48 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KELLY KRUG served on 3/18/2025, answer due 4/8/2025 (Griffin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
3 3 order Standing Order Mon 03/10 10:29 AM
STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/10/2025. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 03/07 10:48 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to KELLY KRUG.(zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/07 10:40 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT against KELLY KRUG ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11525246) filed by JOSEPH J. SHELTON.(Griffin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons