Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Timothy J Corrigan
Referred: Laura Lothman Lambert
Case #: 3:25-cv-00249
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Case in other court:Duval County Circuit Court, 2024-ca-006392
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 6:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The)
Represented By
Scott Alan Richman
Mcdonald Toole Richman & Correnti, P.A.
contact info
Tiffany Marie Gutierrez
Mcdonald Toole Richman & Correnti, P.A.
contact info
Jennifer Nolander Fisher
Mcdonald Toole Richman & Correnti, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Devin Smith
Plaintiff
Jack Fontaine
Represented By
Joseph Pace Mawhinney, II
Morgan And Morgan
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
18 18 misc Status report Tue 04/15 5:44 PM
STATUS report by Jack Fontaine. (Mawhinney, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
17 17 misc Status report Mon 04/14 5:00 PM
STATUS report by Jack Fontaine. (Mawhinney, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
16 16 misc Case Management Report Fri 04/11 9:55 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Gutierrez, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Thu 04/10 5:09 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Jack Fontaine. (Mawhinney, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/07 2:56 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a status report regarding the service of Defendant Devin Smith no later than 4/14/2025. Signed by Senior Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 4/7/2025. (JCD)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/14 2:46 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The).(Fisher, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Order Denying Motion for Remand Case Law
Thursday, March 13, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to amended complaint Thu 03/13 12:29 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 3 Amended Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The).(Fisher, Jennifer) Modified docket text on 3/14/2025 (EVK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
11 11 motion Remand to State Court Wed 03/12 2:58 PM
First MOTION to Remand to State Court and Memorandum of Law in Support by Jack Fontaine. (Mawhinney, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 03/12 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Joseph Pace Mawhinney, II on behalf of Jack Fontaine. Lead Counsel: Pace Mawhinney. (Mawhinney, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 03/12 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 03/11 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Scott Alan Richman on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The). Lead Counsel: Scott A. Richman. (Richman, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 03/10 5:41 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The) identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock Inc., Other Affiliate Vanguard Group Inc. for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The).. (Gutierrez, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/10 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AA)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/10 9:36 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jennifer Elyse Nolander of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AA)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/07 8:42 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:25-cv-TJC-LLL. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/10 9:31 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The), Devin Smith. (Filed in state court on 12/16/24.)(AA) Modified text on 3/10/2025 (AA)
Related: [-]
3 3 9 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/10 9:27 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The), Devin Smith with Jury Demand. filed by Jack Fontaine. (Filed in state court on 3/4/25.)(AA)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/06 5:40 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th Judicial Circuit, Duval County, case number 16-2024-CA-006392-AXXX-MA filed in State Court on 3/6/2025. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23099569 filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The).(Nolander, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 3 State Court ANSWER,
Att: 4 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 5 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet