Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 3:25-cv-00033
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Terminated:May 13, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of Hart County, 24HV00346
Last checked: Sunday Apr 20, 2025 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
WALMART STORES EAST LP
Represented By
NICHOLAS ELIAS DEEB
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREW L WILLIAMS
Represented By
ANNA GREEN CROSS
contact info
JEREMIAH T VAN DORA
contact info

GPO May 12 2025
ORDER dismissing this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/12/2025 (CCL)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Judgment Tue 05/13 11:06 AM
JUDGMENT (aen)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
15 15 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Order on Motion to Remand Order on Motion to Reopen Case Order on Motion for New Trial Mon 05/12 1:10 PM
ORDER dismissing this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/12/2025 (CCL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
14 14 9 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/09 10:36 AM
REPLY to Response filed by ANDREW L WILLIAMS re9 MOTION to Remand (CROSS, ANNA)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 9 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 04/25 4:24 PM
RESPONSE filed by WALMART STORES EAST LP re9 MOTION to Remand (DEEB, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
12 12 7 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/25 4:23 PM
REPLY to Response filed by WALMART STORES EAST LP re5 MOTION to Set AsideMOTION to Reopen CaseMOTION for New Trial (DEEB, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
notice Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Tue 04/01 10:09 AM
Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6.2 requested by WALMART STORES EAST LP re:5 Motion to Set Aside/Motion for Default/Motion for New Trial and9 Motion to Remand. (aen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
11 11 misc Request for Local Rule 6.2/9.4 Clerk's Extension Mon 03/31 5:55 PM
Request for Local Rule 6.2 Clerks Extension re9 MOTION to Remand ,5 MOTION to Set AsideMOTION to Reopen CaseMOTION for New Trial by WALMART STORES EAST LP (DEEB, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/28 12:23 PM
RESPONSE filed by ANDREW L WILLIAMS re5 MOTION to Set Aside (CROSS, ANNA)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Remand Fri 03/28 11:40 AM
MOTION to Remand by ANDREW L WILLIAMS filed by ANNA GREEN CROSS.(CROSS, ANNA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Sheriffs Entry of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Pl. Mot. for Entry of Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Order Granting Default,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Final Judgment,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Case disposition sheet
Friday, March 21, 2025
8 8 2 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/21 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ANNA GREEN CROSS on behalf of ANDREW L WILLIAMS Attorney ANNA GREEN CROSS added to party ANDREW L WILLIAMS(pty:pla)(CROSS, ANNA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
7 7 4 pgs notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/10 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Supersedeas Bond by WALMART STORES EAST LP re6 Order on Motion to Stay. (aen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 03/07 3:40 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Stay Request for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Request to Set A Bond. The Court hereby APPROVES the bond (ECF No. 1-5) in the amount of $3,646,837.02. If the bond has not yet been executed and filed, Defendant shall file the fully executed bond within seven days of todays order. Execution of the judgment is hereby STAYED until further order of the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 03/07/2025. (aen)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs motion Set Aside Fri 03/07 12:53 PM
MOTION to Set Aside by WALMART STORES EAST LP filed by NICHOLAS ELIAS DEEB., #6 Exhibit G - Still Shots of Incident from Second Camera Angle, #7 Exhibit H - Picture of Spill, #8 Exhibit I - Statement of Aunwan Murray, #9 Exhibit J - Georgia State of Emergency Orders and Press Release, #10 Exhibit K - Picture of Soup Container Dropped by Customer, #11 Exhibit L - Typed Incident Report, #12 Exhibit M - Statement of Gwendolyn Fisher, #13 Exhibit N -(Post Judgment Ltr & Rogs & Rpds (svd 2-18-25)(DEEB, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 23 pgs Memorandum in Support Brief,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit A - Declaration of kayla Parham,
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit B - Declaration of Nick DiMarco,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit C - Declaration of Brittany Wilson,
Att: 5 11 pgs Exhibit F - Still Shots of Incident from First Camera Angle
4 4 motion Stay Fri 03/07 12:23 PM
MOTION to Stay Request for Order Staying Execution of Judgment and Request to Set A Bond by WALMART STORES EAST LP filed by NICHOLAS ELIAS DEEB.(DEEB, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Bond,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Graning Motion to Stay
3 3 misc Jurisdictional Statement Fri 03/07 9:09 AM
Jurisdictional Statement by WALMART STORES EAST LP (DEEB, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/07 9:08 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART STORES EAST LP identifying Corporate Parent WALMART INC., Other Affiliate WSE MANAGEMENT LLC, Other Affiliate WSE INVESTMENT LLC, Other Affiliate WAL-MART STORES EAST, LLC (F/K/A WALMART STORES EAST, INC.) for WALMART STORES EAST LP. (DEEB, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/06 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Walmart Stores East, LP Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4886565, $405 filed by Walmart Stores East, LP All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case. (DEEB, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Post Judgment Letter,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit Motion to Stay,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex A - Motion to Stay (Bond),
Att: 6 Exhibit Notice of Electronic Filing
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/06 4:46 PM
Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER no longer assigned to the case. (mdp)
Related: [-]