Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:R Stan Baker
Referred: Christopher L Ray
Case #: 4:25-cv-00047
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Robert Folks
Terminated: 04/11/2025
Adult & Pediatric Specialists 4301 Interstate Dr.
Macon, GA 31210
Plaintiff
State Of Georgia
Terminated: 04/11/2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
5 5 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 04/11 4:03 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 04/11/2025. (jlh)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 04/11 3:59 PM
ORDER ADOPTING the3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the Court's opinion, remanding this case to the Superior Court of Upson County, Georgia, and directing the Clerk of Court to close this case. Signed by Chief District Judge R. Stan Baker on 04/11/2025. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
3 3 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 03/11 10:08 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the1 Notice of Removal filed by Robert Folks should be remanded to the Superior Court of Upson County. Objections to R&R due by 3/25/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/11/25. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 03/06 5:03 PM
Filing Fee Deficiency NOTICE. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/27/2025. (pts)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/06 5:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Robert Folks.(pts)
Related: [-]